MD SB537 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are exempt from paying the out-of-state tuition rate at public institutions of higher education; altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate at a public senior higher education institution or the in-county rate at a community college; requiring certain individuals to retain a certain tuition status until the individual is awarded a certain degree under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-38) (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-38) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Certifications
Community Colleges
Data
Higher Education
Income Tax
Parents and Guardians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Residency
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Tuition
Community Colleges
Data
Higher Education
Income Tax
Parents and Guardians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Residency
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Tuition