MD SB534 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain restrooms in certain public buildings and certain places of public accommodation; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; requiring certain standards to be filed with the Secretary of State; requiring that certain bodies be responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-02-13SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback