MD SB531 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining a "direct primary care agreement" as a written contract in which a primary care provider agrees to provide certain primary care services to a patient for a certain fee and for a certain period of time and that has certain elements; excluding a direct primary care agreement from certain definitions for the purpose of certain provisions of insurance law; and providing that certain provisions of insurance law do not apply to a direct primary care agreement.
Title
Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |