MD SB530 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB345
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1145
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an employer who employs individuals in a food service facility or retail establishment to pay certain employees at a certain rate of pay for certain shifts of work, except under certain circumstances; and providing that certain employees employed in a food service facility or retail establishment have the right to decline to work hours that occur during the 11 hours following the end of a shift; etc.
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB530 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB431 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
SB1145 (Carry Over) 2017-02-24 - First Reading Senate Rules
HB431 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
SB1145 (Carry Over) 2017-02-24 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contracts
Courts
Damages
Discipline
Discrimination
Ethics
Food
Harassment
Health
Hearings
Immigrants and Citizenship
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Labor, Department of
Language
Leave
Notices
Occupational Safety
Overtime
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Threats
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contracts
Courts
Damages
Discipline
Discrimination
Ethics
Food
Harassment
Health
Hearings
Immigrants and Citizenship
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Labor, Department of
Language
Leave
Notices
Occupational Safety
Overtime
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Threats
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 2 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 1811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0530?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0530f.pdf |