MD SB530 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of source of income; stating the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing additional opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in certain neighborhoods; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of source of income; establishing qualifications and limitations on the prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - House - Floor Amendment 543524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Floor Amendment 263922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117
2020-03-11SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (94-42)
2020-03-10HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (43-94)
2020-03-10HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
2020-03-10HouseFloor Amendment {583828/1 (Delegate Buckel)
2020-03-10HouseFloor Amendment {543524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (43-92)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-24HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-02-21SenateThird Reading Passed (34-12)
2020-02-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-19SenateFloor Amendment {263922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29)
2020-02-19SenateFavorable as Amended Adopted
2020-02-19SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {838173/1
2020-02-18SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
2020-02-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {838173/1
2020-02-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-30SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-30SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB231 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government201103(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20701(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20702(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20704(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20705(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20707(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0530?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0530f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0530t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0530_83817301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0530_26392201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0530_54352401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0530_58382801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0530_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0530_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0291.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0350.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0439.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0440.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0441.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback