MD SB525 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-29 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-29 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Distribution System Planning Workgroup to study issues related to energy distribution planning and implementation; requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations on or before January 1, 2024, related to energy distribution planning and implementation; requiring the Commission and the Maryland Energy Administration to coordinate efforts with utilities to apply for certain federal funds; and establishing labor standards for contractors and subcontractors participating in certain projects.
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB88 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-21 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Contractors
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Industry and Technology
Investments
Licenses
Minorities
Motor Vehicles
Public Works
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Contractors
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Industry and Technology
Investments
Licenses
Minorities
Motor Vehicles
Public Works
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0525?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0525f.pdf |