MD SB525 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Baltimore City centralized booking facility to provide a secure, designated ballot drop box for eligible voters in the facility and to monitor the ballot drop box 24 hours a day and 7 days a week; requiring the Baltimore City centralized booking facility to disseminate written notifications directly to each eligible voter in the facility on how and when to use the drop box; requiring the State Board of Elections to provide the Baltimore City centralized booking facility with certain materials and the ballot drop box; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and State Board of Elections - Centralized Booking Facility - Ballot Drop Box

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-12HouseHouse Recede
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (95-43)
2021-04-12HouseMotion Recede (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2021-04-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Lam)
2021-04-12HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-12HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Lam)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-12SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (93-44)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {952510/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-03-23HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-17HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (36-11)
2021-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {644339/1 Adopted
2021-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law1303.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback