MD SB524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to procure or provide for electricity customers energy efficiency and conservation programs and services designed to achieve an annual incremental gross energy savings of at least 0.4% starting in 2023; requiring the Department to develop a plan to coordinate and leverage funding sources to support certain energy efficiency and other home upgrades and a plan to provide energy efficiency retrofits to all low-income households by 2030; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-37) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543525/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB108 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB108 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Conservation
Contractors
Data
Energy
Energy Matters
Eviction
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Leave
Minorities
Poverty
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Reports
Retail Sales
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
Time
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weather
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Conservation
Contractors
Data
Energy
Energy Matters
Eviction
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Leave
Minorities
Poverty
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Reports
Retail Sales
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
Time
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weather
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |