MD SB524 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain types of pollution cases from the Maryland Uniform Contribution Among Joint Tort-Feasors Act; requiring the factfinder in certain legal actions to make a determination of the total liability and assign comparative responsibility to certain parties; authorizing the State to continue to pursue certain legal actions or bring new legal actions if the State has obtained less than complete relief from a certain person who has resolved the person's liability with the State in a settlement; etc.
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
defendants
Environment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Judgments
Liability
Rules and Regulations
Settlement Procedures
Claims
defendants
Environment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Judgments
Liability
Rules and Regulations
Settlement Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 4 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 4 | 421 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 7 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 7 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0524?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0524f.pdf |