MD SB522 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission on Universal Health Care; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to develop a plan for the State to establish, on or before January 1, 2024, a universal health care program to provide health benefits to all residents of the State through a single-payer system; authorizing the Commission, the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, and the Maryland Department of Health to apply for certain waivers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-22SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB470 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General134201(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134202(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback