MD SB517 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering composition of the stakeholder advisory committee to advise the Department of Natural Resources on the scope and management of Port of Deposit State Historical Park; requiring the Department to make a certain report to the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2024; extending the deadline for the Bainbridge Development Corporation to transfer certain property to the Department to June 1, 2025; authorizing the Governor to include in the State budget an appropriation of at least $400,000 for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Port of Deposit State Historical Park - Planning

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602
2023-04-06SenateReturned Passed
2023-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2023-04-05HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2023-03-17HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2023-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2023-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {563220/1 Adopted
2023-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-01SenateHearing canceled
2023-03-01SenateHearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m.
2023-02-03SenateHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment

Same As/Similar To

HB1140 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2022(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources51012(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback