MD SB517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish customer choice shopping websites for electric and natural gas customers; requiring the Commission to use information from electric and natural gas suppliers to maintain the information on the websites; requiring each electricity or natural gas supplier that is actively seeking residential customers in a service territory in the State to maintain at least one open offer on the Commission's website at all times; etc.
Title
Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {657076/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Consumer Price Index
Contracts
Fuel
General Assembly
internet
Prices
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Contracts
Fuel
General Assembly
internet
Prices
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation