MD SB515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, or health maintenance organizations to establish a certain process for requesting an exception to a step therapy or fail-first protocol; prohibiting certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, and pharmacy benefits managers from requiring more than a certain number of prior authorizations for a prescription for difference dosages of the same prescription drug; etc.
Title
Health Insurance – Step Therapy or Fail–First Protocol – Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123128/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB785 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Subjects
Drugs
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations