MD SB514 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a hospital to submit annually a certain report to the Health Services Cost Review Commission at a certain time; requiring the Commission to post certain information on its website; altering the required contents of a hospital's policy on the collection of debts owed by patients; requiring a hospital to provide a refund of certain amounts collected from a patient or the guarantor of a patient who was found eligible for reduced-cost care on the date of service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-02SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-26SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-22SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB565 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19214.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19214.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback