MD SB513 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law that requires a certified public accountant firm to hold a permit issued by the State Board of Public Accountancy if the firm performs certain attest services for a client with a home office in this State; and authorizing a certain firm that does not have an office in this State to perform certain attest services for a certain client in this State without a permit issued by the Board under certain circumstances.
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {484632/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |