MD SB513 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "hospital services" to include a hospital outpatient service that meets specified criteria for the purpose of making it possible for the hospital outpatient service to participate in the federal 340B Program under rates set by the State Health Services Cost Review Commission.
Title
Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {217878/2 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Drugs
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Medical Assistance
Reimbursement Rates
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Medical Assistance
Reimbursement Rates