MD SB510 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing by $7,000 the compensation of the president, vice president, and other members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education.
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education – Member Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-26) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {693524/1 (Delegate D. Jones) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1399 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules