MD SB509 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a tax collector to withhold from tax sale certain real property designated by a county or municipal corporation for foreclosure and sale under a certain process; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to initiate an in rem foreclosure and sale of certain real property for delinquent taxes; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to enact laws authorizing in rem foreclosure and sale of certain real property; authorizing the county or municipal corporation to commence an in rem foreclosure action; etc.
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsors
Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {575468/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {149031/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appeals
Auctions
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Communications
Counties
Counties - Generally
Court of Appeals
Evidence
Fees
Foreclosure
Hearings
Judgments
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Titles
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appeals
Auctions
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Communications
Counties
Counties - Generally
Court of Appeals
Evidence
Fees
Foreclosure
Hearings
Judgments
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Titles