MD SB509 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the salary of each associate judge of the Orphans' Court for Prince George's County from $42,000 to $50,000, and the salary of the Chief Judge from $42,500 to $55,000 per year; and applying the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454
2017-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-17HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2017-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {688276/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-02-16SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0509&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0509f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0509t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_454_sb0509t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0509_68827601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0509.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0509_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0509_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0509,s-0632&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0509,h-1313&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback