MD SB509 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a specified action to be brought to establish title against adverse claims to property; providing for venue and the application of the Maryland Rules in an action under the Act; establishing requirements for a complaint, an answer to a complaint, naming of defendants, joinder of parties, and service of process in an action under the Act; requiring the complaint and statement be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested, and by first class mail to the holder in a specified manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395
2016-04-11SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2016-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-04-06HouseHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-04-05HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2016-03-31HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {258878/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-25SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0509&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0509f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0509t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_395_sb0509t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0509_25887801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0509.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0509_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0509_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0509,s-0857&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0509,h-1279&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback