MD SB509 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Including Dorchester, Somerset, Talbot, Wicomico, and Worcester Counties as counties in which an exceptional hauling permit issued by the State Highway Administration is valid for a combination of vehicles that transports specified forestry products, subject to specified axle configuration requirements, increased maximum load limits, weight tolerances, inspection requirements, operation restrictions and requirements, penalties, record keeping and reporting requirements, and fees; codifying specified provisions of law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Exceptional Hauling Permits - Validity in Select Eastern Shore

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-20 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2010-04-01 Third Reading Passed (139-1)
2010-03-31 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-31 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-07 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2010-03-30 Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-19 First Reading Environmental Matters
2010-04-05 Returned Passed
2010-03-18 Third Reading Passed (46-1)
2010-03-16 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-16 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-15 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2010-02-10 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-03 First Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback