MD SB508 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified county boards of education and specified nonpublic schools from hiring or retaining specified individuals who have been convicted of specified crimes; requiring specified contracts to provide that specified contractors or subcontractors for specified nonpublic schools and specified local school systems may not knowingly assign employees to work on school premises with direct, unsupervised, and uncontrolled access to children if the employee has been convicted of a specified crime; etc.
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Stephen Waugh [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {125366/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814233/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Camps
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Contracts
Criminal Background Investigations
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Group Homes
Home Care Services
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
Safety
Sexual Offenses
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Contracts
Criminal Background Investigations
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Group Homes
Home Care Services
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
Safety
Sexual Offenses
Students
Work, Labor and Employment