MD SB507 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Manufacturing Development Zone Program to encourage business entities engaged in manufacturing outside the State to invest in manufacturing facilities within the State; authorizing specified political subdivisions to apply to have specified areas of the State designated as a manufacturing development zone; requiring a county or municipal corporation to grant a specified property tax credit; authorizing specified business entities to claim a specified credit against the State income tax; etc.
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Corporations
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Mining
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Records
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Corporations
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Mining
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Records
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment