MD SB506 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the period of time that specified individuals at least 25 years old who hold a learner's instructional permit are required to wait before taking an examination for a provisional driver's license; altering specified driving practice requirements before taking examinations for a provisional driver's license that apply to an individual at least 25 years old; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Provisional Driver's Licenses - Driver Education Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (131-5) | |
2012-04-06 | Conference Committee Report 633324/1 Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Delegates Malone, Glenn, and Norman | |
2012-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-05 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 620719/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-06 | Conference Committee Report 633324/1 Adopted | |
2012-04-01 | Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank | |
2012-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 918176/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |