MD SB505 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a workers' compensation insurer to file a rating plan that provides for a premium discount of up to 4% for specified risks to an insured that has an alcohol- and drug-free workplace policy that may include one or more specified programs; and providing that an insurer is not required to provide a premium discount under the Act if the insured is required under federal or State law to test its employees for drugs or otherwise provide an alcohol- and drug-free workplace.
Title
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {717676/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Education
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Job Training
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Education
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Job Training
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation