MD SB502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide, subject to a certain limitation, mental health services appropriately delivered through telehealth to a patient in the patient's home setting; altering the definition of telehealth as it applies to certain entities; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to certain waivers to implement a pilot program to provide telehealth services under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; etc.
Title
Telehealth – Mental Health and Chronic Condition Management Services – Coverage and Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {853521/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {437875/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {437875/1 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Boundaries
Contracts
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Public Health
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Contracts
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Public Health
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |