MD SB502 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the unexpired or partial term of a member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland appointed to fill a vacancy does not qualify as a full term for the purposes of the prohibition against a member serving more than 2 consecutive full terms; authorizing the Board of Regents to make a one-time transfer of up to $25,000,000 from the non-State supported fund balance to a quasi-endowment fund; limiting the use of certain proceeds to certain purposes; and providing for the application of certain provisions.
Title
University System of Maryland – Board of Regents and Quasi–Endowment Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Delegates Jones, B. Barnes, and Ciliberti |
2018-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senators King, Ferguson, and Serafini |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2018-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {314769/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {429230/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Investments
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Higher Education
Investments
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges