MD SB501 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the standards for signage at a regional mall parking lot by requiring that, before being authorized to tow or remove a vehicle, the owner or operator of the parking lot must place certain signs at each entrance to the parking lot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (112-25)
2021-04-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-24HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-16HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-11SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-09SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-05SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-05SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-25SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation2110A-02(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback