MD SB496 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing certain financing during fiscal years 2021 and 2022 for the purpose of relieving the adverse effects of the coronavirus pandemic; allowing, for certain taxable years, a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for certain unemployment insurance benefits; allowing, for certain taxable years, a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for certain coronavirus relief payments received by a person during the taxable year; etc.
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2021-02-12 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (130-1) |
2021-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-12 | House | Floor Amendment {925969/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2021-02-12 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {973228/1 Withdrawn |
2021-02-12 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2021-02-12 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {973228/1 |
2021-02-12 | House | Floor Amendment {173722/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn |
2021-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295660/1 Adopted |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {519631/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment {119837/1 Adopted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {119837/1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB612 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Administrative Office of the Courts
Agriculture
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Business Trusts
Commerce and Business
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Corporations
Counties
COVID-19
Economic and Community Development
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Federal Aid
Governor
Grants
Health
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Insurance
Juvenile Services, Department of
Labor, Department of
Legal Aid
Limited Liability Companies
Loans
Maryland Emergency Management Agency
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
pandemics
Partnerships
Private Schools
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Schools
Public Service Commission
Reports
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Aid
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Sales and Use
Time
Tourism
Transportation
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Utilities
Women
Administrative Office of the Courts
Agriculture
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Business Trusts
Commerce and Business
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Corporations
Counties
COVID-19
Economic and Community Development
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Federal Aid
Governor
Grants
Health
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Insurance
Juvenile Services, Department of
Labor, Department of
Legal Aid
Limited Liability Companies
Loans
Maryland Emergency Management Agency
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
pandemics
Partnerships
Private Schools
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Schools
Public Service Commission
Reports
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Aid
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Sales and Use
Time
Tourism
Transportation
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Utilities
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 549 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 559 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |