MD SB496 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination of the Payroll Recovery Act of 2017, which requires the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to administer the payroll of certain employees of the State and employees of certain universities and colleges in a certain manner and requires that certain grievances are handled in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payroll Recovery Act - Sunset Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-40) (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (100-40)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-16HouseReassigned to Appropriations
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback