MD SB496 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Higher Education Commission to enter into the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement; and exempting specified institutions that participate in the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement from the requirement to register with the Commission if they enroll Maryland students in a fully online distance education program in the State.
Title
Maryland College Education Export Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interstate Affairs
Registration
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Higher Education Commission
Interstate Affairs
Registration
Telecommunications and Information Technology