MD SB495 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1186

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a person charged with reckless or negligent driving that contributes to an accident that results in the death of another person must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-05SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-25SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1186 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
HB668 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21901.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback