MD SB490 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to employ a chief inspector; and providing for the salary of the chief inspector to be fixed by the Board as in a general county classified salary schedule, within nonrepresented pay schedule NR-05.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 653929/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 453122/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 223126/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 91 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 943325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 92 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 353123/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 653929/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 453122/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 223126/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 91 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 943325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 92 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 353123/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-38) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {653929/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-91) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {453122/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (40-93) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {223126/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {943325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (39-92) |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {353123/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (41-92) |
2021-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 5:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {754433/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Public Officials
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Anne Arundel County
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Public Officials
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |