MD SB484 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1294
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Victim Services to develop a poster to notify a victim of the right to request a certain private room in a law enforcement agency or unit when reporting a crime, other than homicide, that primarily involves injury to a person; requiring a certain law enforcement agency to display a poster developed by the State Board of Victim Services informing a victim of the right to request a private room; and requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide a certain private room to a certain victim.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB193 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
HB1294 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1294 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Abduction
Abuse
Assault
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Extortion
Harassment
Human Trafficking
Law Enforcement
Privacy
Public Information
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
Threats
Victims
Abuse
Assault
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Extortion
Harassment
Human Trafficking
Law Enforcement
Privacy
Public Information
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
Threats
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |