MD SB484 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that a specified percentage of operating costs for specified public transit services must be recovered by the Maryland Transit Administration from specified revenues; altering requirements for specified annual reports submitted by the Administration to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-17) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-17) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-50) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-17) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {919231/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {919231/1 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Fees
Mass Transit
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation - Generally
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Fees
Mass Transit
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation - Generally