MD SB482 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, subject to certain limitations, to provide reimbursement for certain medically necessary and appropriate behavioral health services to managed care organizations; requiring managed care organizations, rather than a certain delivery system, to provide certain health services beginning January 1, 2021; requiring the Secretary of Health to include in certain capitation payments funding for community provider rates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-13SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-14SenateHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback