MD SB480 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, for certain fiscal years, the Comptroller to distribute certain abandoned property funds to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund; establishing the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund to provide grants to the University of Maryland School of Law, the University of Baltimore School of Law, and the Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service to operate tax clinics for low-income Marylanders; authorizing the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2024, to include an appropriation to the Fund in the budget bill; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (131-7)
2021-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {535660/1 Adopted
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-01HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-18HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {369031/1 Adopted
2021-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-20SenateHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB421 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education11409(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2608.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2609(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback