MD SB480 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the State distribute certain funding directly to the South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority; and providing, under certain circumstances, that the State distribute directly to the Authority not less than the 50% of the local impact grants from video lottery proceeds required to be distributed under a certain law.
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {435866/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499431/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |