MD SB480 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority to collect an assessment or a charge not exceeding 5 cents per ticket under specified circumstances; specifying the circumstances under which the Authority may collect an assessment or a charge; and providing for an exception to a specified limitation regarding sources of operational funding for the Authority.
Title
Public Utilities - Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
Municipal Corporations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Voting
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
Municipal Corporations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Voting