MD SB479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain prohibition to prohibit a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where a minor could gain access to the firearm; altering a certain exception to the prohibition; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where an unsupervised minor could gain access to the firearm and an unsupervised minor does gain access to the firearm and the firearm causes harm to the minor or another person; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Storage
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 4 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0479?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0479f.pdf |