MD SB478 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB850
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating certain findings of the General Assembly; prohibiting the State or any local jurisdiction from entering into agreements facilitating immigration-related detention by private entities; prohibiting governmental entities from approving zoning variances or permits for the construction or reuse of buildings to house immigration-related detainees; requiring governmental entities to terminate existing contracts for the detention of immigration-related detainees not later than October 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB16 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB850 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
SB850 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Building Permits
Contracts
Federal Government
Immigrants and Citizenship
Law Enforcement
Liability
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Privatization
Public Safety
Zoning and Planning
Contracts
Federal Government
Immigrants and Citizenship
Law Enforcement
Liability
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Privatization
Public Safety
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |