MD SB478 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee to develop on or before January 1, 2022, a certain methodology, in consultation with the Department of the Environment and the Department of General Services, for a unit to estimate greenhouse gas emissions that occur through the life cycle of certain food; requiring each unit to report to the Committee on the unit's progress in reducing the greenhouse gas emissions associated with food procured by the unit on or before August 1, 2024 and each August 1 thereafter; etc.
Title
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB772 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Agriculture
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Food
General Services, Department of
Prices
Procurement
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Time
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Food
General Services, Department of
Prices
Procurement
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0478?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0478f.pdf |