MD SB471 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to review and update specifications for sediment control plans in a certain manner on or before December 1, 2025, and every 5 years thereafter; prohibiting the Department from authorizing the discharge of stormwater associated with construction activity under a general discharge permit unless certain requirements are satisfied; and requiring the Department to take certain public notice and comment actions if a person makes a written request within the public notification period of the permit.
Title
Sediment Control Plans, Discharge Permits for Stormwater Associated With Construction Activity, and Notice and Comment Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-10) |
2023-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313727/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {893521/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB607 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-03 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Commercial Property
Construction
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Erosion
Fines
Flood Control
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Shore Erosion
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Construction
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Erosion
Fines
Flood Control
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Maps and Charts
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Shore Erosion
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 323.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 342 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |