MD SB467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the limit, from $20,000 to $30,000, that the Maryland Home Improvement Commission can award from the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund to one claimant for certain acts or omissions of one contractor.
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Commission - Award Limits
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-29) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB917 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Subjects
Business Regulation
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Home Improvement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Weights and Measures
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Home Improvement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 8 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |