MD SB466 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing the funding allocation for the State Library Resource Center to be calculated as $1.89 per State resident in fiscal year 2022, $1.93 per State resident in fiscal year 2023, and $1.97 per State resident in each fiscal year thereafter.
Title
Public Libraries - State Library Resource Center - Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959634/1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |