MD SB463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available a specially designed registration plate that features the statement "Submarine Warfare".
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Submarine Warfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Veterans
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 619.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |