MD SB462 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB740
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-24 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-24 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission, for the 2021-2023 program cycle, by regulation or order, to the extent that the Commission determines that low-income programs are available, to require the Department of Housing and Community Development to procure or provide for electricity customers energy efficiency and conservation programs and services designed to achieve a target annual incremental gross energy savings of at least 1% per year starting in 2022; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Low-Income Housing - Energy Performance Targets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB379 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
SB740 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
SB740 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 211.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0462?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0462f.pdf |