MD SB459 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide comprehensive technical assistance to any business that qualifies for financial assistance under the Act or any other program in the portfolio of the Corporation; requiring the technical assistance provided by the Program to incorporate existing services of the Corporation and to include customized applied training services, the use of a network of experienced advisors, and support with accessing private capital; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {857278/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Mentors
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Mentors
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |