MD SB458 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $33,810,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Calvert County
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works