MD SB456 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each Office of the State's Attorney to collect and disclose certain information relating to prosecutions and office policies to the the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services; requiring the Office to determine the manner in which the State's Attorneys transmit and publish certain information; requiring the Office to publish online certain information in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-27SenateHearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-27SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-25SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB502 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure15501(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure15502(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure15503(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure15504(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure15505(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure15506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback